MA S511 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a public harbor dredging program with the Division of Waterways. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Establishing a regional dredge grants program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2540 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S221 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H374 (Similar To) 2020-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1907 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H451 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H374 (Similar To) 2020-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1907 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H451 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S511 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S511.pdf |