MA S53 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2683
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to internet fairness for local newspapers and musicians. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Relative to internet fairness for local newspapers and musicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2683 |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
Same As/Similar To
H104 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H120 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S960 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H123 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S45 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S58 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1923 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S56 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S57 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S2683 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S986 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H120 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S960 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H123 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S45 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S58 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1923 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S56 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S57 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S2683 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S986 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S53 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S53.pdf |