MA S530 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2240
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect the confidentiality of patient prescription records. Health Care Financing.
Title
Protecting the confidentiality of patient prescription records
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Moore [D] | Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] | Sen. Karen Spilka [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2240 |
2011-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Health Care Financing. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2240 (Replaced by) 2012-05-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S530 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13846&generalCourtId=1 |