MA S544 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 325 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 325 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate the Quabbin Visitor Center, in the town of Belchertown, as The Les and Terry Campbell Quabbin Visitor Center. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Designating the Quabbin Visitor Center, in the town of Belchertown, as The Les and Terry Campbell Quabbin Visitor Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 325 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-22 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-07-19 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-15 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Accompanied by H1028 |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1028 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Accompanied S544
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S544 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S544.pdf |