MA S551 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2478
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public funds. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to public funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2478 |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-07-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 27, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-26 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 6, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-21 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, pending concurrence |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 10:30 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2478 (Replaced by) 2016-08-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S479 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1664 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S929 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S878 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2369
H850 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2861 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
S1491 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S479 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1664 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S929 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S878 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2369
H850 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2861 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
S1491 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S551 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S551.pdf |