MA S561 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4060
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure equal access to college course materials for visually impaired students. Higher Education.
Title
To ensure equal access to college course materials for visually impaired students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4060 |
2011-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2011 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4060 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S561 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14567&generalCourtId=1 |