MA S561 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2262
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reform labor rates paid by insurance companies to auto repairers in the Commonwealth. Financial Services.
Title
Reforming labor rates paid by insurance companies to auto repairers in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2262 |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2262 (Replaced by) 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S497 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1526 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
S481 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1485 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S491 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H844 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1459 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S476 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4169
S566 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H2715 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
S497 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1526 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
S481 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1485 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S491 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H844 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1459 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S476 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4169
S566 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H2715 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S561 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S561.pdf |