MA S573 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Stony Brook Reservation. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to Stony Brook Reservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S2289 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2299 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3910 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2024
S2455 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - See H2081
H2299 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3910 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2024
S2455 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - See H2081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S573 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S573.pdf |