MA S599 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4460
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to illegal immigrants and publicly subsidized housing
Title
Relative to illegal immigrants and publicly subsidized housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Michael Knapik [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4460 |
2011-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4460 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S599 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12369&generalCourtId=1 |