MA S602 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1148
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the treatment of epilepsy and seizure disorders. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to the treatment of epilepsy and seizure disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Accompanied by H1148 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S833 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1087 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S539 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1088 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S543 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1224 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2405 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1073 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3047 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1148 (Replaces) 2018-05-29 - Accompanied S602
H4725 (Similar To) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742
S1087 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S539 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1088 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S543 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1224 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2405 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1073 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3047 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1148 (Replaces) 2018-05-29 - Accompanied S602
H4725 (Similar To) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S602 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S602.pdf |