MA S628 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2543
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to dental insurance assignment of benefits. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to dental insurance assignment of benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2543 |
2019-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S667 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1349 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H602 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S722 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S624 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1137 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3798 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1349 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H602 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S722 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S624 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1137 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3798 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S628 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S628.pdf |