MA S64 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2132
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase neighborhood safety and opportunity. The Judiciary.
Title
To increase neighborhood safety and opportunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2132 |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-05-12 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S2132 (Replaced by) 2016-03-10 - New draft substituted, see S2156
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1818 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H627 (Similar To) 2016-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
S1879 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S2515 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1818 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H627 (Similar To) 2016-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
S1879 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S2515 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S64 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S64.pdf |