MA S651 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2097
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2097
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2097
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation for reimbursement for costs of the ‘Learning Contract’. Higher Education.
Title
For reimbursement for costs of the ‘Learning Contract’
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2097 |
2015-09-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2097 (Replaced by) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S653 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S652 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S1369 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
H2348 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S653 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S652 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S1369 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
H2348 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S651 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S651.pdf |