MA S652 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to LGBTQ family building. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to LGBTQ family building
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-04-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1044 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S700
S673 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S956 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S310 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
H2484 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1470 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1190 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S700 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S673 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S956 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S310 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
H2484 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1470 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1190 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S700 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S652 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S652.pdf |