MA S665 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2890
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2890
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2890
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Massachusetts public bank. Financial Services.
Title
To establish a Massachusetts public bank
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2890 |
2022-05-26 | House | House concurred |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2890 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2890 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S665 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S665.pdf |