MA S677 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure equitable health coverage for children. Health Care Financing.
Title
To ensure equitable health coverage for children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2167 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2020
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H1088 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H941 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2167 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2020
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H1088 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H941 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S677 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S677.pdf |