MA S694 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-24 - New draft substituted, see S2481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-24 - New draft substituted, see S2481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to voluntary withdrawal of land from registration. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to voluntary withdrawal of land from registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-24 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2481 |
2012-12-24 | Senate | Read second |
2012-12-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-12-24 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2481 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2012 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2481 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S694 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12020&generalCourtId=1 |