MA S7 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to forming a special
Title
Special senate committee to review and report on citizen engagement and participation in the legislative process
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Temporary Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
S2061 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
S6 (Similar To) 2017-01-04 - Adopted
H3652 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2061 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
S6 (Similar To) 2017-01-04 - Adopted
H3652 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S7 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S7.pdf |