MA S707 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to college and universities tuition and fees. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to college tuition and fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2487 |
2017-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S668 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S112 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1590 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1376 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2998 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4159
H2997 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1583 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4159 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4810
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4807 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S668 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S112 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1590 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1376 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2998 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4159
H2997 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1583 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4159 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4810
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4807 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S707 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S707.pdf |