MA S71 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2345
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to prevention of EBT fraud. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to prevention of EBT fraud
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2345 |
2017-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S72 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S222 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S295 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2353
S999 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2327
S852 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S831 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1256 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1287 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1378 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H2445 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S332 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2350
H220 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2061 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3904 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2345 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S222 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S295 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2353
S999 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2327
S852 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S831 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1256 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1287 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1378 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H2445 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S332 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2350
H220 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2061 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3904 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2345 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S71 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S71.pdf |