MA S743 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure uniform and transparent reporting of medical debt data. Health Care Financing.
Title
To ensure uniform and transparent reporting of medical debt data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Accompanied H1222 |
2023-08-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1222 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2770 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4421 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2666 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4838 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2770 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4421 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2666 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4838 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S743 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S743.pdf |