MA S748 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the elective share of surviving spouses. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the elective share of surviving spouses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S705 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1460 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1958
S755 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S659 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S992 (Similar To) 2016-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2451
S1562 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4235
S1719 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1494 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S896 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1555 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1557 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1611 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1550 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1860 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S1436 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1440 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S705 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1460 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1958
S755 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S659 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S992 (Similar To) 2016-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2451
S1562 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4235
S1719 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1494 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S896 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1555 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1557 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1611 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1550 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1860 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S1436 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1440 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S748 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S748.pdf |