MA S753 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2541
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the endowment match program. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to the endowment match program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2541 |
2019-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H481 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2233 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S744 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
H2322 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1227 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H2345 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S2541 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2233 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S744 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
H2322 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1227 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H2345 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S2541 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S753 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S753.pdf |