MA S754 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure access to the full range of treatment options for people with obesity. Health Care Financing.
Title
To ensure access to the full range of treatment options for people with obesity
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4634 |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2263 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4854
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Reported, in part, by H962
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Reported, in part, by H962
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S754.pdf |