MA S776 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to define a default warrant. The Judiciary.
Title
Regarding the definition of a default warrant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S711 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S678 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Reported (residue) S2102
S605 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S174 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S884 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S711 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S678 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Reported (residue) S2102
S605 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S174 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S884 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S776 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S776.pdf |