MA S777 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to insubstantial, frivolous or bad faith claims in district and municipal courts. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to insubstantial, frivolous or bad faith claims in district and municipal courts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S715 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2419
S687 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied H1070
H1242 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1198 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1352 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S680 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
H1228 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S715 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2419
S687 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied H1070
H1242 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1198 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1352 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S680 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
H1228 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S777 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S777.pdf |