MA S790 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2528
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the disclosure of services covered by condominium fees and property taxes. Housing.
Title
Requiring the disclosure of services covered by condominium fees and property taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2528 |
2019-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H2764 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H696 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3410 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1284 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S2299 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2528 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H696 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3410 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1284 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S2299 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2528 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S790 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S790.pdf |