MA S795 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to maintain independent authority over nursing licensure in the commonwealth. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to maintaining independent authority over nursing licensure in the commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Sen. Pavel Payano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S795 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S795.pdf |