MA S796 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2299
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update privacy protections for personal electronic information. The Judiciary.
Title
Updating privacy protections for personal electronic information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2299 |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2299 |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2299 (Replaced by) 2014-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S796 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S796.pdf |