MA S799 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2527
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create affordable housing in every community. Housing.
Title
Creating affordable housing in every community
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2527 |
2019-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S814 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S813 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1273 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S773 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S333 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2457 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H1623 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2389 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2527 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S813 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1273 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S773 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S333 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2457 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H1623 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2389 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2527 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S799 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S799.pdf |