MA S807 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a low-income sewer and water assistance program . Housing.
Title
To provide sewer and water rate relief
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3164 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1308 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1931 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1791 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H3164 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1308 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1931 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1791 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S807 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S807.pdf |