MA S81 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a Center on Child Wellness and Trauma. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Creating a Center on Child Wellness and Trauma
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-08-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S358 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
H3254 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S974 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3104 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2542 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1868 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S140 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1400 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
S251 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4671
S399 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S92 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
H3254 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S974 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3104 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2542 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1868 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S140 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1400 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
S251 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4671
S399 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S92 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S81 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S81.pdf |