MA S83 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize municipalities to expend certain funds for the acquisition of land to be used for rail trails. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Authorizing municipalities to expend certain funds for the acquisition of land to be used for rail trails
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H374 (Similar To) 2020-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S514 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S514 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S83 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S83.pdf |