MA S846 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2815
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2815
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2815
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create higher education opportunities for students with intellectual disabilities, autism, and other developmental disabilities. Higher Education.
Title
Creating higher education opportunities for students with intellectual disabilities, autism, and other developmental disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2815 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
H1331 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4695
H1337 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4695
S2815 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4695 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
H1331 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4695
H1337 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4695
S2815 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4695 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S846 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S846.pdf |