MA S850 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5035
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the use of community preservation funding by local public housing authorities. Housing.
Title
Relative to local public housing authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5035 |
2024-07-15 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S2365 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S902 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1373 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H5035 (Replaced by) 2024-09-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S902 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1373 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H5035 (Replaced by) 2024-09-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S850 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S850.pdf |