MA S856 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2714
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Finish Line Scholarship Program. Higher Education.
Title
Establishing the Finish Line Scholarship Program
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2714 |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1362 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
S1950 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2714 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S1950 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2714 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S856 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S856.pdf |