MA S880 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to parental choice of terminology in certain domestic relations matters. The Judiciary.
Title
Relating to parental choice of terminology in certain domestic relations matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S880 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S880.pdf |