MA S886 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S886 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S886.pdf |