MA S898 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1428
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts rental voucher program. Housing.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts rental voucher program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Accompanied by H1428 |
2021-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H2652 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2111 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S1980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2073 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2827
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S293 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1428 (Replaces) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied S898
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2111 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S1980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2073 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2827
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S293 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1428 (Replaces) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied S898
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S898 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S898.pdf |