MA S9 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S13
Note: Legislation replaced by S30
Note: Legislation replaced by S30
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a next-generation roadmap for Massachusetts climate policy. Temporary Ways and Means.
Title
Creating a next-generation roadmap for Massachusetts climate policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Question on adoption of Amendment recommended by the Governor Roll Call #19 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Enacted Roll Call #3 (Y: 144 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Engrossed Roll Call #2 (Y: 144 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Enacted Roll Call #3 (Y: 144 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Engrossed Roll Call #2 (Y: 144 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2021-03-18 | House | Re-enacted - 145 YEAS to 14 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 15 ) |
2021-03-18 | House | Governor's amendment adopted, in concurrence - 146 YEAS to 13 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 14 ) |
2021-03-18 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Governor's amendment adopted, in the form recommended by Senate Bills in the Third Reading -- see Roll Call #19 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Bills in the Third Reading Report (S30) accepted |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table negatived |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Bills in Third Reading Report considered, for text see S30 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Governor returned to Senate with amendment, see S13 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-28 | House | Enacted - 144 YEAS to 14 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 3 ) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third |
2021-01-28 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 144 YEAS to 14 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 2 ) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading discharged report accepted |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read third |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Temporary Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S13 (Replaced by) 2021-02-08 - See S9
S30 (Replaced by) 2021-03-11 - See S9
H2167 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H481 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H954 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3438 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S604 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
S577 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2224 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2225 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
S2226 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2229 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
S2133 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2230 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4044 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S30 (Replaced by) 2021-03-11 - See S9
H2167 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H481 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H954 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3438 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S604 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
S577 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2224 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2225 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
S2226 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2229 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
S2133 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2230 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4044 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken