MA S905 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2598
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen laws combatting human trafficking and protecting survivors of modern-day slavery. The Judiciary.
Title
To strengthen laws combatting human trafficking and protecting survivors of modern-day slavery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2598 |
2017-12-04 | House | House concurred |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1497 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S906 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2598
S907 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2599
S1905 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2362
S1353 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2305 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1108 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S1574 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S995 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S934 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H766 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H950 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H949 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H702 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H1680 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4047 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2018
S2151 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
S2584 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2598 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S906 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2598
S907 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2599
S1905 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2362
S1353 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2305 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1108 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S1574 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S995 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S934 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H766 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H950 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H949 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H702 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H1680 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4047 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2018
S2151 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
S2584 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2598 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S905 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S905.pdf |