MA S921 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a middle-skills council and the creation of regional skills academies in the Commonwealth. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Establishing a middle-skills council and the creation of regional skills academies in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Senate | Accompanying a new draft, see S2206 |
2011-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S921 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14423&generalCourtId=1 |