MA S927 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Worcester County Commission on the Status of Women. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Establishing the Worcester County Commission on the Status of Women
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-10-03 | House | Enacted |
2013-10-02 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-07-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-07-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-07-29 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S927 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S927.pdf |