MA S936 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to private construction contracts. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to private construction contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2011-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S936 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10138&generalCourtId=1 |