MA S939 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve protections for sexual assault survivors. The Judiciary.
Title
Improving protections for sexual assault survivors
Sponsors
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S671 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S190 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4013 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2021
H1820 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1753 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1100 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1095 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S176 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3136 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1617 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H311 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S190 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4013 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2021
H1820 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1753 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1100 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1095 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S176 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3136 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1617 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H311 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S939 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S939.pdf |