MA S940 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance courthouse security. The Judiciary.
Title
Enhancing courthouse security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-07 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-05 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-05 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Accompanied by H1519 |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1519 (Replaces) 2015-10-08 - Accompanied S940
S939 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Accompanied H1518
S184 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S124 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1572 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S416 (Similar To) 2015-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1955
H1243 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1369 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4371 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Adopted, in concurrence
S939 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Accompanied H1518
S184 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S124 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1572 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S416 (Similar To) 2015-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1955
H1243 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1369 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4371 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S940 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S940.pdf |