MA S955 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to sexual deviants. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to sexual deviants
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S877 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H22 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3535 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H993 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H22 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3535 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H993 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S955 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S955.pdf |