MA S959 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to examinations for applicants to the trial court. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to examinations for applicants to the trial court
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-11-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2080 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H136 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1282 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2989 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4180
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H136 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1282 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2989 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4180
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S959 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S959.pdf |