MA S960 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4605
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure uniformity in education discrimination complaint procedures. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Ensuring uniformity in education discrimination complaint procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4605 |
2015-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4605 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S283 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S593 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S984 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1663 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H3156 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4230
S1559 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H1610 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S522 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H920 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H966 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S283 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S593 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S984 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1663 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H3156 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4230
S1559 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H1610 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S522 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H920 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H966 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S960 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S960.pdf |