MA S960 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the statute of limitations for sex crimes in Massachusetts. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the statute of limitations for sex crimes in Massachusetts
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S910 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S902 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2314 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2272 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3060 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S902 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2314 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2272 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3060 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S960 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S960.pdf |